Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gutierrez, Robert, Landavazo Bros. Inc., Knoebel & Associates,Inc., Construstion Forms, Inc., filed a(n) Product Liability case against Simmons T.E. Ltd., Simmons Group,Ltd., Landavazo Bros. Inc., Knoebel & Associates,Inc., Construction Forms, Inc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Wynne S. Carvill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWynne S. Carvill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2010 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Time To Trial138 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions902 days |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1372 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Gutierrez
Date: 2010-08-27T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed (Amended)
Date: 2010-08-27T00:00:00Letter re CMC TCMO Confirmation Filed
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2010-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2010-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Gutierrez Filed
Date: 2010-12-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2010-08-27T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2010-10-12T00:00:00Letter re Request for Telephonic Appearance Filed
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail as to the Complaint Filed
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Proof of Service on Complaint
Date: 2011-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2010-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Gutierrez Filed
Date: 2011-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/12/2011 03:15 PM D- 302
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-01-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Request to Appear by CourtCall Filed
Date: 2011-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2011-04-22T00:00:00Request Re: Complaint in Intervention Granted
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Request Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: 2011-06-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2011-09-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous /Request for Special Notice and for Copies of Pleadings and Discovery Filed
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2011-09-20T00:00:00Answer to Complaint in Intervention Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2011-07-27T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2011-10-14T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2011-10-12T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2011-10-11T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 11/14/2011 08:30 AM D- 24
Date: 2011-10-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2011-10-14T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint Issued
Date: 2011-10-14T00:00:00Amended Notice of Motion to compel physical examination of the courts's tentative ruling procedure F
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Letter re Request for Motion date Filed
Date: 2011-11-02T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Construstion Forms, Inc.
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Construstion Forms, Inc.
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of New Hamshire Insurance Company Filed
Date: 2012-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Construstion Forms, Inc. Filed
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-01-09T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2011-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support Jennifer K. Stinnett Filed
Date: 2012-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Construstion Forms, Inc. Filed
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Denied
Date: 2012-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Gutierrez Filed
Date: 2011-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Gutierrez Filed
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of New Hamshire Insurance Company Filed
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement of New Hamshire Insurance Company Filed
Date: 2012-01-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed
Date: 2012-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2012-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Construstion Forms, Inc. Filed
Date: 2012-04-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2012-07-24T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2012-12-04T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Construstion Forms, Inc.
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability Filed
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2012-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2012-12-06T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Construction Forms, Inc.
Date: 2012-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2012-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Gutierrez Filed
Date: 2012-04-24T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Construction Forms, Inc.
Date: 2012-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Physical/Mental Examination Filed for Defendant
Date: 2012-12-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2012-12-17T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial 09/03/2013 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition re Mtn/Protective Order Filed
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00Motion for Joinder Filed for Defendant
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Amended Notice of Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed
Date: 2012-12-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Knoebel & Associates,Inc.
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-01-10T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Further Examination Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/17/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Motion for Joinder Granted
Date: 2013-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Physical/Mental Examination Denied
Date: 2013-01-10T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Adjudication 02/27/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Knoebel & Associates,Inc.
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Frank Roesch Filed for Knoebel & Associates,Inc.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/03/2013 08:45 AM D- 522
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Reply ISO Mtn/Protective order Filed
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Construstion Forms, Inc.
Date: 2013-01-16T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint Issued
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Frank Roesch Granted
Date: 2013-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-01-16T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/20/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Objections of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-01-22T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2013-02-05T00:00:00Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for Landavazo Bros. Inc.
Date: 2013-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2013-02-06T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2013-01-22T00:00:00Objection To Peremptory Challenge by Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-02-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Simmons Group Ltd. Filed
Date: 2013-02-14T00:00:00Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Granted
Date: 2013-01-31T00:00:00Order Vacating and Setting Aside Order Granting Peremptory Challenge to Judge Dennis Hayashi Filed
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Filed
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed
Date: 2013-02-06T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2013-02-14T00:00:00Order Filed
Date: 2013-03-11T00:00:00Non-Opposition to Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed by Robert Gutierrez
Date: 2013-04-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/15/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Letter from court of appeal dated 2-13-13 Filed
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Declaration & Opposition to Exparte Application seeking Vacating & Setting Aside, etc Filed by Rober
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Construction Forms, Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Knoebel & Associates,Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Answer to Complaint in Intervention Filed for Knoebel & Associates,Inc.
Date: 2013-03-04T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Adjudication 05/15/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed for Cross Defendant
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Order from DCA Filed
Date: 2013-03-11T00:00:00Ruling Taken Under Submission
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Gutierrez Filed
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Order Granting Landavazo Bros. Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues Filed
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 03/07/2013 04:00 PM D- 21
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Cross Complainant
Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted in Part
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Brief in Opposition to Application Re: Vacating Order Setting Aside Peremptory Challenge Filed
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Order from DCA Filed
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice as to Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Notice of of Unavailabitlity Filed
Date: 2013-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of New Hamshire Insurance Company Filed
Date: 2013-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of New Hamshire Insurance Company Filed
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Granted
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Notice of non-opposition to cross-deft's motion to continue pre-trial conference and trial dates Fil
Date: 2013-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2013-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2013-07-01T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-10T00:00:00Ruling Taken Under Submission
Date: 2013-07-10T00:00:00Reply to the Opposition from Plaintiff to its Motion to Compel Filed
Date: 2013-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Non Opposition of Plaintiff in Intervention to Motion to Continue Trial Filed
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Physical/Mental Examination - Granted in Part
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Taken Under Submission
Date: 2013-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Denied
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Continue Trial Filed
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Response Filed
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) - Granted in Part
Date: 2013-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate/Sever Issues Filed for Defendant
Date: 2013-08-01T00:00:00Notice of of deposit of Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2013-07-12T00:00:00Order re: Defendant Landavazo Bros., Inc.'s Application for Order Shortening Time Filed
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel Physical/Mental Examination Taken Under Submission
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2013-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Filed
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) - Dropped
Date: 2013-06-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Cross Defendant
Date: 2013-06-12T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:00Notice of of Jury Deposit Fees Filed
Date: 2013-07-17T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 07/31/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2013-06-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Physical/Mental Examination Filed for Defendant
Date: 2013-07-12T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Knoebel & Associates,Inc.
Date: 2013-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2013-07-12T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 07/10/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-07-09T00:00:00Declaration in Support Reply of Cross-Defendant to the Opposition from Plaints to its Motion to Comp
Date: 2013-07-22T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-10T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Bifurcate Filed
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for New Hamshire Insurance Company
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Filed
Date: 2013-08-12T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 08/21/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-08-20T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 08/07/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2013-08-29T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Application for an Order Shortening Time Relative to Its Prop
Date: 2013-08-20T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Knoebel & Associates,Inc.
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00Motion To Bifurcate Trial on Issues - Dropped
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Motion to Confirm Good Faith Settlement Granted
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed for Defendant
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: 2013-08-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous Pre-Trial Order Filed
Date: 2013-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (Amended) on Motion Filed
Date: 2013-08-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Taken Under Submission
Date: 2013-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate/Sever Issues - Dropped
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Granted in Part
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Motion To Bifurcate Trial on Issues Filed by Construstion Forms, Inc.
Date: 2013-08-13T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Construction Forms, Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-08-29T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Construstion Forms, Inc.
Date: 2013-08-20T00:00:00Motion to Confirm Good Faith Settlement Filed for Defendant
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2013-08-21T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2013-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: January 21, 2014Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Construction Forms, Inc., Knoebel & Asso
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 30, 2014Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 11/04/2013 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-10-07T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed
Date: December 18, 2013Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Robert Gutierrez Filed
Date: 2013-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2013-09-04T00:00:00Partial Dismissal as to party - Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Landavazo Bros. Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2013-09-09T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Knoebel & Associates,Inc. Filed
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 23, 2013Dismissal as to Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: January 27, 2014Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-11-04T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2013-11-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.