Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Whitney, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Butler, Roland, Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with John M. True, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M. True, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial229 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time424 days |
Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Whitney Davis
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2010-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Order Petition for Late Claim Filed
Date: 2010-07-15T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/30/2010 03:00 PM D- 512
Date: 2010-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Whitney Davis Filed
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-11-30T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Granted
Date: 2011-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2010-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 01, 2011Notice of unavailability of counsel Filed
Date: May 12, 2011Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2011-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District
Date: 2010-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Whitney Davis Filed
Date: 2011-02-16T00:00:00Pre-Trial Setting Order Order Setting Civil Case For Trial Filed
Date: 2011-03-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: September 12, 2011Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-11-30T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District
Date: 2011-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2011-01-31T00:00:00Notice of of Unavailability of Counsel Filed
Date: May 16, 2011Case Management Statement of Raven Stewart Filed
Date: March 21, 2011Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: March 15, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.