Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bohbot , Anita, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Marshall I. Whitley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarshall I. Whitley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time885 days |
Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/21/2010 03:30 PM D- 301
Date: 2010-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit) Filed
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-11-10T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/15/2010 03:00 PM D- 301
Date: 2010-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Mediation Date Filed
Date: 2011-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit) Filed
Date: 2010-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 29, 2012Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2010-03-23T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 21, 2012Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit) Filed
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2010-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit) Filed
Date: 2011-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Report Filed
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit) Filed
Date: 2011-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Anita Bohbot Filed
Date: March 12, 2012Substitution of Attorney Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit)
Date: February 24, 2012Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/17/2011 03:30 PM D- 18
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: August 24, 2012Answer to Complaint Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit)
Date: 2010-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service re: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-09-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District (AC Transit)
Date: February 15, 2012Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2010-03-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anita Bohbot
Date: 2010-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 29, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.