Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Singleton , Lillian, Singleton , Roderick, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against O'Kelly, Sandra Louise, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Richard O. Keller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard O. Keller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial572 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1720 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1877 days |
Answer to Complaint Filed for Sandra Louise O' Kelly
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Recusal of Arbitrator Filed
Date: 2010-07-07T00:00:00Rejection of Arbitrator Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2010-06-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Blanket Challenge to All Commissioner and/or Referees Filed
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2010-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-06-15T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2010-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roderick Singleton
Date: 2010-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton Filed
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sandra Louise O' Kelly Filed
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Arbitrators Issued
Date: 2010-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2010-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator Issued
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/15/2010 02:30 PM D- 608
Date: 2010-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing AMENDED Date to be determined Filed
Date: 2010-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2010-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing September 28, 2010 @ 10:00 AM Filed
Date: 2010-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2010-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator Issued
Date: 2010-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-08-24T00:00:00Declaration of A. E. Perry re not completing non-binding judicial arbitration Filed
Date: 2010-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2010-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Recusal of Arbitrator Issued
Date: 2010-07-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for Sandra Louise O' Kelly
Date: 2010-08-24T00:00:00Rejection of Award/Trial De Novo Filed
Date: 2011-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-01-06T00:00:00Declaration Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sandra Louise O' Kelly Filed
Date: 2011-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Award of Arbitrator Issued
Date: 2011-06-28T00:00:00Award of Arbitrator Filed
Date: 2011-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-04-29T00:00:00Declaration Re: Extension of Time Filed for Sandra Louise O' Kelly
Date: 2010-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton Filed
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton Filed
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton Filed
Date: 2011-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Form Interrogatories, Set Two Filed
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton
Date: 2011-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-08-23T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/03/2012 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2011-10-13T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/16/2012 08:45 AM D- 522
Date: 2011-10-13T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton
Date: 2012-09-04T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2012-09-07T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00Order Granting Motion to Continue Pre-Trial Readiness Conference and Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sandra Louise O' Kelly Filed
Date: 2012-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-09-04T00:00:00Notice of of Change of handling Attorney Filed
Date: 2012-04-03T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2012-10-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-09-06T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 09/05/2012 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2012-09-04T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: 2012-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-09-04T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/08/2013 09:30 AM D- 31
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton Filed
Date: 2012-09-05T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/07/2012 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2012-09-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous re: Opposition to Pltfs' MTN allowing The Deposition Filed
Date: 2012-09-07T00:00:00Opposition re: plt mtn allowing The Deposition Filed
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted
Date: 2012-09-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton Filed
Date: 2012-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-09-04T00:00:00Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sandra Louise O' Kelly Filed
Date: 2012-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition Denied
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Motion Filed by Roderick Singleton, Lillian Singleton
Date: 2012-11-16T00:00:00Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen Discovery Allowing the Deposition Filed
Date: 2013-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2013-07-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Removal of Admitted Exhibits Filed
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous Special Verdict Form Filed
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: February 23, 2015Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: December 29, 2014Rejection Letter Issued on Assignment of Judgment
Date: December 01, 2014Letter from Christopher L. Patton dated February 27, 2014 Filed
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: October 21, 2014Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Sandra Louise O'Kelly
Date: 2014-03-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4 Filed
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: October 14, 2014Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Order re: Stipulation to Continue Trial Filed
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 02/19/2014 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/15/2014 08:45 AM D- 522
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Request Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Sandra Louise O' Kelly
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Sandra Louise O' Kelly Filed
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2 Filed
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Request Re: Order Shortening Time Denied
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous Stipulation to Continue the Trial Date Filed
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign in Sheet for Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Receipt for Removal of Non-Admitted Exhibits and Depositions Filed
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3 Filed
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00Returned Mail: Declaration of Service By Mail Filed
Date: December 12, 2014Amended Judgment Filed
Date: January 23, 2015Judgment Entered
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Sandra Louise O'Kelly
Date: October 24, 2014Judgment Entered
Date: January 23, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.