Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hassan, Walid, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hamam, Mohamed, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Dawn B. Girard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDawn B. Girard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2009 |
CategoryCh-100 Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment As to Mohamed Hamam Filed | |
August 26, 2009 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Dawn B. Girard |
||
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dropped | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment As to Mohamed Hamam Filed | |
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted | |
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 08/26/2009 09:00 AM D- 102 | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration Additiona Information Filed | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Filed | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Notice for Ex Parte Application for Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.