Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
1948 East 29Th Street, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Robinson, Sheila, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions8 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time36 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: September 30, 2008Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sheila Robinson Filed
Date: October 08, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 1948 East 29th Street, LLC
Date: September 30, 2008Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: November 05, 2008Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Sheila Robinson Filed
Date: October 08, 2008Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: October 02, 2008Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: October 08, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.