Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fair Deal Market, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Super Que, Llc, Everett, Mary, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Winifred Younge Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinifred Younge Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateApril 22, 2008 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions304 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1101 days |
Proof of Service on Complaint As to Super Que, LLC Filed
Date: 2008-04-29T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: May 01, 2009Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-04-22T00:00:00Declaration Re: Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation Filed for Fair Deal Market, Inc.
Date: April 10, 2009Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00Declaration Re: Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation Filed for Fair Deal Market, Inc.
Date: 2009-02-20T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial Filed
Date: June 17, 2009Declaration Re: Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation Granted
Date: May 01, 2009Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Super Que, LLC Filed
Date: 2009-02-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Fair Deal Market, Inc.
Date: 2008-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2008-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 28, 2009Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered
Date: 2009-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2008-04-23T00:00:00Declaration Re: Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation Denied
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/20/2008 09:00 AM D- 23
Date: 2008-04-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: April 28, 2011Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: April 20, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.