Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Kha VS Doe

Case Last Refreshed: 9 months

Case Overview

On October 1, 2007 A Civil case was filed by Kha, Vien Van, against Doe, John, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

October 1, 2007

Last Refreshed

Nov 03, 2020

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Auto Tort

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Cycle Time

373 days

Time To Management

310 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Plaintiff

Defendant

Attorney

See all parties

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Case Management Conference

judge: Jon S. Tigar

Docket Event Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/05/2008 08:45 AM D- 21
Docket Event Case Management Statement of Vien Van Kha Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/06/2008 08:45 AM D- 21
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/13/2008 08:45 AM D- 21
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.