Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pirio, Vickie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Flores, Miguel Angel, Horizon Freight System, Inc., Kaplan Trucking Company, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Kenneth Mark Burr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth Mark Burr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management322 days |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2007 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time524 days |
Letter dated 4/1/508, to Judge Burr, re: request to continue CMC filed Filed
Date: April 18, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Vickie Pirio
Date: 2007-01-12T00:00:00Status Report of mediation (in letter format) Filed
Date: April 22, 2008Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 30, 2007Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: June 19, 2008Answer to Complaint Filed for Miguel Angel Flores, Horizon Freight System, Inc., Kaplan Trucking Com
Date: 2007-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Vickie Pirio Filed
Date: 2007-11-15T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2007-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 30, 2007Proof of Service on Complaint As to Horizon Freight System, Inc. Filed
Date: 2007-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaplan Trucking Company Filed
Date: 2007-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Miguel Angel Flores, Horizon Freight System, Inc., Kaplan Trucking Comp
Date: 2007-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Assignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2007-10-10T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/30/2007 11:15 AM D- 30
Date: 2007-10-10T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/10/2008 09:15 AM D- 30
Date: April 21, 2008Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2007-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Miguel Angel Flores Filed
Date: 2007-02-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.