Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Domenic P. Ali, Renee M. Contratto, Patricia J. Sullivan, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Robin Rudderow, against Domenic P. Ali, Gmac Mortgage Corporation, Renee M. Contratto, represented by Alan M. Phillips, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2004 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: December 14, 2004Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: February 16, 2005Motion to Strike Answer Filed for Plaintiff
Date: January 26, 2005Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patricia J. Sullivan
Date: 2004-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Domenic P. Ali Filed
Date: 2004-12-28T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Domenic P. Ali, Renee M. Contratto
Date: 2005-01-13T00:00:00Demurrer to Answer Filed by Patricia J. Sullivan
Date: 2005-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Other Real Property As to Patricia J. Sullivan Filed
Date: 2005-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Renee M. Contratto Filed
Date: 2004-12-28T00:00:00Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2004-12-28T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2005-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action Filed
Date: 2004-12-14T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2004-12-14T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed
Date: 2005-02-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike Answer Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2005-01-26T00:00:00Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: 2005-03-09T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 04/11/2005 09:00 AM D- 135
Date: 2005-02-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Answer Filed
Date: 2005-03-02T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2005-02-28T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2005-01-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Domenic P. Ali, Renee M. Contratto
Date: 2005-01-13T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Answer Filed
Date: 2005-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike Answer - Granted in Part
Date: 2005-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2005-02-16T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2005-02-28T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiff's counsel appearance by phone Filed
Date: 2005-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 26, 2005Case Management Statement of Renee M. Contratto, Domenic P. Ali Filed
Date: 2005-04-01T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party GMAC Mortgage Corporation Filed
Date: 2005-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2005-04-11T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Renee M. Contratto, Domenic P. Ali Filed
Date: 2005-07-08T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2005-07-22T00:00:00General Denial to Cross-Complaint Filed for Patricia J. Sullivan
Date: 2005-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Filed
Date: 2005-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2005-04-11T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: September 27, 2005Case Management Statement of Patricia J. Sullivan Filed
Date: 2005-03-22T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Renee M. Contratto, Domenic P. Ali
Date: 2005-03-21T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Patricia J. Sullivan Filed
Date: 2005-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2005-03-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.