Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ruzic, Anne M, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ruzic, Robert D, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Pritchard, Kenneth G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePritchard, Kenneth G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: November 12, 2021Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: November 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Hearing | Proof of Service | |
January 05, 2022 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
January 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
January 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service | |
December 22, 2021 | Hearing | ||
December 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Temporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing)
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
December 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
December 22, 2021 | Hearing | Request for DV Restraining Order Existing No Children | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.