Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Altaone Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Leahy, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time2302 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 16, 2010 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
March 14, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1095 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CARRIE KAUKAS APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: CARRIE KAUKAS DEFENDANT IS IN IRAQ. MOTION FOR MATTER TO GO OFF CALENDAR IS GRANTED. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 14, 2008 | Hearing |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
|
March 14, 2008 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1095 Department: BR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CARRIE KAUKAS APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: CARRIE KAUKAS DEFENDANT IS IN IRAQ. MOTION FOR MATTER TO GO OFF CALENDAR IS GRANTED. CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
February 22, 2008 | Hearing | Original Application & Order of Exam | |
February 11, 2008 | Hearing |
Order to Appear for Exam RE: ALTAONE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION HEARING DATE: 3/14/08 HEARING TIME: 10:30 AM HEARING DEPT/DIV: BR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.