Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Olson, Robert, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stein, Roger I, against Boornazian, Rachel, represented by Silva, Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Kenneth G. Pritchard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth G. Pritchard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2008 |
Category06-Cl >10K <25K Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2010 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
October 29, 2010 | Hearing |
4006 Case Status Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
October 29, 2010 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference
Judge: Pritchard, Kenneth G. |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
4006 Case Status Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
September 21, 2010 | Hearing | Notice of Discharge of Bankruptcy | |
May 03, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated DEF HAS FILED A STAY HEARING VACATED ~ calid=1222771 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4041, CourtDate:04/30/2010, Courtroom:AR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:22, SessionType:STL, Judge:KP, Deputy:heatherd, SystemDate:4/29/2010 3:54:43 PM |
|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated DEF HAS FILED A STAY HEARING VACATED ~ calid=1222771 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4041, CourtDate:04/30/2010, Courtroom:AR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:22, SessionType:STL, Judge:KP, Deputy:heatherd, SystemDate:4/29/2010 3:54:43 PM |
|
April 30, 2010 | Hearing |
4041 Further Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
April 30, 2010 | Hearing | Notice of Stay of Proceeding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.