Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
United States Of America, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Scheer Law Group Llp, against Jennifer Adams, Jackie Schementi, represented by Unrepresented, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 17, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ps)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions60 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time79 days |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS4 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/16/19 AT 8:00 IN CUD
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JACKIE SCHEMENTI (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00DECLARATION OF SPENCER P SCHEER FILED
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00ORDER FOR SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER MICKIE E REED.
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/17/2019 OF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND FILED.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR JACKIE SCHEMENTI WAS GRANTED FOR FILING FEE; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00FILED: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY POSTING & MAILING
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JACKIE SCHEMENTI IS GRANTED; CLERK BMILLER (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: August 16, 2019WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: August 16, 2019WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: September 04, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.