Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leejay Mintz, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by The Kruger Law Firm, against Jrnl Two Bunch Palms Llc, represented by Law Office Of Tracey Lazarus, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with David M. Chapman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Chapman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryOther-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort-Over $25,000 (Palm Springs)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time784 days |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (05/15/17) FILED
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY LEEJAY MINTZ.
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00FAX FILING BY LEEJAY MINTZ ($2.00 PER PAGE).
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC.
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY LEEJAY MINTZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY LEEJAY MINTZ.
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC.
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00FAX FILING BY LEEJAY MINTZ ($2.00 PER PAGE).
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY LEEJAY MINTZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT PURPOSES
Date: July 02, 2018CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF DOCUMENT QUALITY ASSURANCE.
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE: (2018 APRIL 18) FILED
Date: April 20, 2018NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC FILED.
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC FOR HEARING 04/18/18.
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2016 OF LEEJAY MINTZ AND FILED.
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY LEEJAY MINTZ
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/17/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC.
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY LEEJAY MINTZ
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00COPY(S) MADE
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00FAX FILING BY LEEJAY MINTZ ($2.00 PER PAGE).
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER CONTI TRIAL BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC FILED
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY JRNL TWO BUNCH PALMS LLC
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL
Date: January 03, 2019MINUTE ORDER: RE 1/7/19 HEARING
Date: January 03, 2019SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTCE OF OSC HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.
Date: May 23, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.