Indio Bermuda Palms Apt Llc,
filed a(n)
Unlawful Detainer -
Property
case
represented by
William M Garrett Jr. Attorneyat Law,
against
Martha Olivia Nava,
represented by
Unrepresented,
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Indio Bermuda Palms Apt Llc v. Martha Olivia Nava
Case Events for
Indio Bermuda Palms Apt Llc v. Martha Olivia Nava
Date
Type
Description
June 24, 2015
Hearing
DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER Vacated
June 01, 2015
Docket Event
FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED. Not Applicable
May 13, 2015
Docket Event
PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/23/2015 OF INDIO BERMUDA PALMSAPT LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/23/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS) Not Applicable
May 13, 2015
Docket Event
APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169. Not Applicable
May 13, 2015
Docket Event
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/23/2015 OF INDIO BERMUDA PALMSAPT LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MARTHA OLIVIA NAVA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/23/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) Not Applicable
May 13, 2015
Docket Event
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY INDIO BERMUDA PALMSAPT LLC. Not Applicable
May 13, 2015
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/23/2015 OF INDIO BERMUDA PALMSAPT LLC AS TO MARTHA OLIVIA NAVA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Not Applicable
May 13, 2015
Docket Event
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY Not Applicable
May 13, 2015
Docket Event
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED Not Applicable
April 23, 2015
Docket Event
COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (PALM SPRINGS) Not Applicable