Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jessica Lacroix, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Munn, Ford D, against Deborah Gallego, Denise Gallego, Denise Gallegos, represented by Unrepresented, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 07, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ps)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions22 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time118 days |
COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/08/14 AT 8:00 IN CUD
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JESSICA LACROIX - INDIO (FORM UD-150).
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DEBORAH GALLEGO IS GRANTED; CLERK B.SHELTON (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (PALM SPRINGS)
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL OF NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL LODGED IN FILE.
Date: February 02, 2015REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DENISE GALLEGO (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2014-10-10T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR DEBORAH GALLEGO WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DENISE GALLEGO IS GRANTED; CLERK B.SHELTON (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2014-10-10T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DEBORAH GALLEGO (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: October 30, 2014DENISE GALLEGO ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DENISE GALLEGOS
Date: 2014-10-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR DENISE GALLEGO WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2014-10-10T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF FILING PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION.
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JESSICA LACROIX.
Date: October 30, 2014COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - INDIO SET FOR 10/29/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS3.
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL OF NOTICE OF FILING PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF LODGED IN FILE.
Date: February 02, 2015FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.
Date: November 19, 2014HEARING RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET 11/04/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS3
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.