Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mexico Express Of Nevada Llc, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Diaz Manuel J., against Martinez Juan Miguel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts San Fernando Courthouse with Howard J. Schwab presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward J. Schwab Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2002 |
CategoryPetn To Comp/Conf Arbitration (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions514 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Fernando Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeReq. For Dismissal - Entire Action |
Case Cycle Time514 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2003 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 03, 2003 | Docket Event |
in Department F48, Howard J. Schwab, Presiding Request for Dismissal - ENTERED Judge: Howard J. Schwab |
|
June 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
in Department C, Howard J. Schwab, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL) - Matter continued Judge: Howard J. Schwab |
|
June 13, 2003 | Hearing |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
May 27, 2003 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Filed by Clerk |
|
May 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department C, Howard J. Schwab, Presiding Petition - Miscellaneous (** off calendar/moving party **) - Matter Placed Off Calendar Judge: Howard J. Schwab |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event | Petition filed-No Summons Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.