Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mexico Express Of Nevada Llc, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Diaz Manuel J., against Video Nayarita, Perez Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts San Fernando Courthouse with Howard J. Schwab presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward J. Schwab Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2001 |
CategoryPetn To Comp/Conf Arbitration (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions791 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Fernando Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeReq. For Dismissal - Entire Action |
Case Cycle Time791 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2003 | Docket Event |
in Department F48, Howard J. Schwab, Presiding Request for Dismissal - ENTERED Judge: Howard J. Schwab |
|
July 03, 2003 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
in Department C, Howard J. Schwab, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL) - Matter continued Judge: Howard J. Schwab |
|
May 27, 2003 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Filed by Clerk |
|
April 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department C, Howard J. Schwab, Presiding Petition - Miscellaneous (TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD) - Matter Placed Off Calendar Judge: Howard J. Schwab |
|
February 04, 2002 | Hearing |
Petition (TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
in Department C, Howard J. Schwab, Presiding Petition - Miscellaneous - Off Calendar - Moving Party Judge: Howard J. Schwab |
|
May 03, 2001 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.