Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Triplett, Foy, Triplett, Shauntae, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PR Order Appointing Court Investigator | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Counsel for a Child Regarding Qualifications | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Referred to CPS | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.