Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rosebury, Teresa, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Referral to Sherry Scott | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.