Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Byers, Nancy, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Annual Guardianship Review Hearing | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Referral to Sherry Scott | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Annual Guardianship Review Hearing | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PR Letters of Guardianship | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PR Order Appointing Guardian | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Tickler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.