Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lee, Calvert Tolman filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Six Month Review
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Dec & Ord Reimbursement Conservator/Guardian Investigation | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Six-Month Review Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.