Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dehaan, Reni Lynn, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of Final Distribution | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | PR Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
PR- Petition for Final Distribution
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PR Order Final Distribution | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PR Notice of Hearing - Probate | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PR Petition for Final Distribution | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PR Inventory & Appraisal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.