Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sandner, Tony, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of Final Distribution | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PR Order Final Distribution | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PR- Petition for Final Distribution
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PR Notice of Hearing with Proof of Service | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PR Notice of Hearing - Probate | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PR Petition for Final Distribution | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PR Waiver of Accounting | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.