Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nielson, Lawrence, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time52 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
PR - Probate Notice of Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition - No Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.