Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Borrowman, Hedwig K, Truschinger, Rhonda S, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition for Letters of Special Administration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application Filed
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Accounting Report Filed
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.