Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kingston, Nori, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time201 days |
Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: May 20, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 20, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 20, 2020Order Appointing Administrator with Bond of
Date: December 07, 2020Letter Sent To:
Date: September 19, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: June 29, 2020Request for Special Notice Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: August 08, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 06, 2023Notice Filed re:
Date: May 29, 2020Comment:
Date: June 23, 2020Letters Issued
Date: December 07, 2020Petition for Letters of Special Administration Filed
Date: August 27, 2020Waiver Filed Re:
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Proof of Publication re:
Date: November 17, 2020Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 19, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 01, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 05, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 16, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 27, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 27, 2020Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: February 08, 2022Petition Filed
Date: May 20, 2020Proof of Holographic Will Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Filed re:
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Holographic Will Filed
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 29, 2020Temporary Letters Issued
Date: September 03, 2020Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 29, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 23, 2020Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: August 27, 2020Order Appointing Administrator with Bond of
Date: September 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Citation Issued
Date: September 19, 2023Proof of Publication re:
Date: November 25, 2020Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: August 08, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 22, 2020Return Mail
Date: March 20, 2023Notice Sent re:
Date: August 26, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 24, 2022Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: August 30, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 25, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service CITATION |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Sent To: AMERICAN EAGLE AGENCY |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
September 19, 2023 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's office to: | |
September 19, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service NO FORWARDING ADDRESS |
|
August 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Mail IMPORTANT CORRESPONDENCE MIN OTDER 03/06/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.