Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Gilleece, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilleece, Michelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time393 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Hearing | Order to be filed | |
August 24, 2021 | Hearing | Accounting Approved Comment First and Final | |
August 24, 2021 | Hearing | Accounting Review View Document Examiner Notes - 1st Check View Document **PR - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Gilleece, Michelle Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held | |
August 02, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Service View Document Proof of Service Comment ON 08/02/21 VIA MAIL SEE ATTACHED LIST | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | Supplemental Report Filed View Document Supplemental Report Filed Comment TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR | |
June 17, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed View Document Notice of Hearing Filed Comment 08/24/21 | |
June 17, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY | |
June 17, 2021 | Hearing | Accounting Review Judicial Officer Gilleece, Michelle Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY | |
May 19, 2021 | Hearing | Accounting Report Filed View Document Accounting Report Filed Comment FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT | |
March 17, 2021 | Hearing | Letters Issued View Document LETTERS ISSUED (ADMINISTRATION) Comment LETTERS ISSUED (ADMINISTRATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.