Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
George P. Medina, Hannah Tereza B. Medina, Sarah Cerena Medina, Old Republic Surety Company, Seaboard Surety Company, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Unrepresented, Webster & Webster, against Sarah Cerena Medina Mea, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2003 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND CONFIRMING DELIVERY OF AS SETS FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: 2ND AND FINAL ACCT, ATTY FEES FILED ON 05/26/06 BY BITUIN MEDINA - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Microsoft OLE DB Provider for Oracle error '80004005' Oracle error occurred, but error message could not be retrieved from Oracle. /iotw/functions.asp, line 665 | |
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF BITUIN P MEDINA FILED RE: STATEMENT RE BOND; CLARIFICATON OF PET ITEM 17 Not Applicable |
|
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF BITUIN P MEDINA FILED RE: ORIGINAL BANK STATEMENT Not Applicable |
|
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NTC OF HRG GUARDIANHP/CTORSHP & END & FNL ACCT, R EQ FOR INSTRUCTIONS, DECL ON 101006 TO DEPT OFMEN Not Applicable |
|
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF CHARLES WILDMAN FILED RE: WAIVING ATTY FEES Not Applicable |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF PAMENT OF MONIES DUE AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: 2ND AND FINAL ACCT, ATTY FEES SET BY D61 ON 7/26/06 - Minutes COMPLETED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.