Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Donohue, Nikki Linn, Gomez, Deborah, Gomez , Julian, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Pro Se, against Gavin Terrance Hansen Biggs, Gracelynn Jae Gomez, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with John P. Devine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Devine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED ON 09/22/21 BY NIKKI LINN DONOHUE - Minutes | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED ON 09/22/21 BY NIKKI LINN DONOHUE - Minutes Complete |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED ON 09/22/21 BY NIKKI LINN DONOHUE - Minutes Complete |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED ON 09/22/21 BY NIKKI LINN DONOHUE - Minutes | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION OF INDIAN STATUS - PARTY: NIKKI LINN DONOHUE Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON GUARDIANSHIP FILED 1/7/22, 930AM, D15 W/POS BY MAIL ON 12/28/21 Not Applicable |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
(PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED ON 09/22/21 BY NIKKI LINN DONOHUE - Minutes Complete |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED ON 09/22/21 BY NIKKI LINN DONOHUE - Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.