Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Howe, Kirsten filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Joyce Geraldine Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2012 |
CategoryLetter - No Will |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time41 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION & ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY/COPIES Not Applicable |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED STIPUPLATION AND ORDER SETTLING FRST AND FNL ACCT AND RPT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY LINDA ANN RYME Not Applicable |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: AMD FRST AND FNL ACCT AND RPT OF STATUS OF ADMIN AND PETITION FILED ON 08/30/13 BY LINDA ANN RYMEL - Minutes GRANTED |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: FRST AND FNL ACCT AND RPT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION FILED ON 05/14/13 BY LINDA ANN RYMEL - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: FRST AND FNL ACCT AND RPT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION FILED ON 05/14/13 BY LINDA ANN RYMEL - Minutes Complete |
|
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON AMENDED 1ST & FINAL ACCOUNT FILED W/POS BY MAIL 9/5/13 LINDA RYMEL, LARRY ANDERSON HRG 10/10/13 9AM D14 Not Applicable |
|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUBSEQUENT PETITION AMD FRST AND FNL ACCT AND RPT OF STATUS OF ADMIN FILED BY LINDA ANN RYMEL Not Applicable |
|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING WAS SET FOR 10/10/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14 | |
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON AMENDED FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT FILED WITH POS BY MAIL ON 08/09/13 HEARING DATE 09/12/13 9AM DEPT 14 Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.