Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cole, Linda L filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Kelly Richard Hudson, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
CategoryLetter - No Will |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1433 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 61 TO 14. Not Applicable |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 14 TO 61. Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 61 TO 14. Not Applicable |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PETN FOR ORDER TRANSFERRING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY FILED ON 05/02/07 BY TRINA D HUDSON - Minutes GRANTED |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION CONSENT TO JUDGE PRO TEM ROBERT KOSLOFF FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF TRINA D HUDSON FILED RE: PETITION FOR ORDER TRANSFERRING TITLE Not Applicable |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S) Not Applicable |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER TRANSFERRING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
APPROVAL OF PETITION FOR ORDER TRANSFERRING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PAULINA HUDSON Not Applicable |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
APPROVAL OF PETN FOR ORDER TRNSFRING TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.