Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Amit Taneja, against Michael R. Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2020 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 04/23/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D14 DROP REASON: POS FILED | |
January 06, 2020 | Action | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED, AS TO: DEFT, MICHAEL JORDAN, BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 12/23/19; THEREAFTER MAILED ON 12/27/19; DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED. | |
October 25, 2019 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 10/23/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: D14 | |
October 25, 2019 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 04/23/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D14 | |
October 23, 2019 | Action | THIS CASE EXEMPT FROM TIME STANDARDS: LIMITED CIVIL COLLECTIONS CASE. | |
October 23, 2019 | Action | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 23, 2019 | Action | COMPLAINT/FIRST PAPER ACCOUNT STATAED, MONEY LENT | |
October 23, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: PLTF, CAVALRY SPV I, LLC - 225.00 | |
October 23, 2019 | Action | CASE OPEN / ACTIVE STATUS HON ANDREW E SWEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.