Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Joy R. Leighton, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Kathryn Kirkland, against Peter E. Leighton, represented by John E. Manoogian, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2000 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2002 | Action | STIPULATION (AND ORDER) FOR CHANGE OF VENUE TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT; BOTH PARTIES AND THEIR MINOR CHILDREN HAVE MOVED TO AND RESIDE IN CONTRA COSTA; RESPONDENT SHALL BEAR THE COSTS INCURRED FOR THE CHANGE OF VENUE AND TRANSFER OF THE COURT'S FILE TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY. HON. JOHN A SUTRO, JR. MAILED 5/24/02. | |
April 19, 2002 | Action | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED, AS TO: RESPONDENT, PETER E. LEIGHTON, SUBSTITUTES JOHN E. MANOOGIAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD IN PLACE OF HIMSELF IN PRO PER. | |
April 13, 2001 | Action | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED, AS TO: RESP SUBSTITUTING PRO PER FOR RICHARD M. MARX. | |
January 29, 2001 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
June 16, 2000 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
June 07, 2000 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: RESP, PETER LEIGHTON - 188.00 1ST APPEARANCE - (RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR NOTICE OF MOTION) | |
May 30, 2000 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 06/16/2000 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV IN DEPARTMENT: 07 MOVE REASON: MATTER BEING HEARD BY JUDGE DURYEE FROM DATE: 06/16/2000 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV FROM DEPARTMENT: 06 | |
May 24, 2000 | Action | APPEARANCE MOVED TO: 06/16/2000 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV IN DEPARTMENT: 06 MOVE REASON: RESCHEDULED TO DEPT 6 BY COURT FROM DATE: 06/16/2000 FROM TIME: 09:00 AM FROM APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV FROM DEPARTMENT: 04 | |
May 19, 2000 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
April 21, 2000 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 05/19/2000 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: LMCV IN DEPARTMENT: 04 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.