Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Davis, Debbie, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
*Other Hearing
Date: September 14, 2021*Other Hearing
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Other Hearing PETN TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF TRUST PROPERTY Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents PETITION TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF TRUST PROPERTY |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER DETERMINING OWNERSHIP OF TRUST PROPERTY |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE TO PROBATE NOTES |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate Amended - FILED |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Other Hearing Petition to Determine Ownership of Trust Property Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Order Adjudicating Claim to Property PC850 Petition to Determine Ownership of Trust Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.