Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Campbell, Lori A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
*Other Hearing
Date: January 18, 2022*Other Hearing
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Other Hearing FINAL DISTRIBUTION Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance All appearing parties and counsel. |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To ORDER TO CAL SHELF |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Other Subsequent Petition Filed First and Final Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account and Petition for Allowance of Statutory Compensation to Attorneys, and Compensation to Attorneys for Extraordinary Services, and For Final Distribution |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents WE ARE RETURNING YOUR DOCUMENTS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH A $435.00 FILING FEE. THANK YOU. |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.