Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Speegle, Layla, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Annual Review
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Minute Order *Motion CHILD VISITATION Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE FOR REVIEW DEPT 3 TASKS |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY SHELLEY SHARP |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee Guardian's Response to Motion for Child Visitation: HRG 11/17/23 |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney ATTORNEY SARAH B. ORR IN PLACE OF PRO PER PET |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED SHELLEV SHARP BY MAIL SERVICE ON 10/4/23 WITH FL-306 AND FL-309 |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order FL-309 Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Continued by Party's Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.