Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Massey, Taylor, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person & Estate
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person & Estate TEMP Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Citation FILED |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY PET |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Investigator | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents THE DECLARATIONS HAVE TO BE SUBMITTED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENTS WITHIN THE SAME ENVELOPE SO THEY ARE BOTH FILED - ALSO THE DOCUMENTS ARE NOT DATED |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Citation ISSUED |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Screening Form | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.