Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Enos, Anthony Neopolani, Hausey, Frond Gelee, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
*Guardianship
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Guardianship
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Minute Order *Guardianship TEMP Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Without prejudice |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum TO THE COURT; FILED BY COURT INVESTIGATOR |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDERS AND LETTERS |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Investigator | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate TEMP |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Duties of Guardian | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Confidential Screening Form FROND HAUSEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.