Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mcalexander, Claudean Ives filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Robert A. Glusman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Glusman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2015 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time832 days |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: March 27, 2018Amended - No Fee
Date: August 04, 2017Order
Date: February 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Hear Counsel Re: Final discharge |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Re Final Discharge Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Second Amended (To Correct The Amended) Joint Stipulation And Order Disclaiming Interest In A Testamentary Gift And Transferring Real Property From The State To The Sole Control And Possession Of Marlane McAlexander Osman Order Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Hear Counsel Re: Final discharge. |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Review Hearing Re: Final Discharge Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Settling Amended First and Final Account, Directing Distribution and Final Distribution Order Settling Amended First and Final Account, Directing Distribution and Allowing Compensation of Statutory Fees to Personal Representative and Attorney and for Final Distribution Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Granted The first and final account is approved. The Executors to submit a formal order within two-weeks. A final discharge hearing date is set 2/27/18 at 9:00am. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.