Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Casas, Jessica Gayle, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case against Pettigrew, Norval Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time86 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: PETN TO REMOVAL OF CO'TRUSTEE Disp Code: 220 - APPROVED Disp Clerk: MKI Filing Clerk: MKI Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order AMENDED ORDER FOR REMOVAL OF CO-TRUSTEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MKI |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition or Opposition - Internal Affairs of a Trust DEC OF NORVAL LEROY PETTIGREW IN RESP TO AMEND PETN FOR REMOVAL OF CO'TEE CK#3332606 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 685106 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: MKI 547 - $435.00 |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MKI | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information AMENDED PETN FOR REMOVAL OF CO'TEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MKI |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: PETN FOR REMOVAL OF CO-TRUSTEE Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: MKI Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition or Opposition - Internal Affairs of a Trust PTN FOR REMOVAL OF CO-TRUSTEE CK# 1016 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 676953 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: BMK 547 - $435.00 |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.