Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vaters, Diane L filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time722 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Distribution ADDITIONAL RECEIPT ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION JAMES E KRAMER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice CONTINUANCE FEE FROM MARCH HRNG PD BY COUNSEL JAMES E KRAMER CK# 3274 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 710873 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: CLL 451 - $20.00 |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Final Discharge EX PARTE PTN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE & ORDER **IN HOLD NO SASE** Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of Final Distribution | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: FINAL DISCHARGE Desc3: **$20 CONT FEE ORDERED 3/20/14 STILL DUE Disp Code: 224 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Distribution RECEIPT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL ACCT & REPORT OF ADMIN Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Desc: 1ST & FINAL ACCTG, FEES, FINAL DISTRIB Desc2: *CONT FROM 3/20/14, 4/14/14 Desc3: **$20 CONT FEE ORDERED 3/20/14 STILL DUE Disp Code: 220 - APPROVED Disp Clerk: BMK Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT OF ADMINISTRATOR & ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.