Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brunson, Ronda filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Michael P. Candela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Candela Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2004 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions857 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time3762 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: STATUS RE TRANSFER TO LA COUNTY Desc2: CONTD FROM 3/12/15 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: BMK Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR DOCUMENTS FILED LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT CASE# BP160375 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: STATUS RE TRANSFER TO LA COUNTY Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 04/09/15 Disp Clerk: CLL Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF VENUE (RECORD PREP FOR TRANSFER) ck# 229 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 716929 Fee Amount: 50.00 Entry Clerk: BMK 453 - $50.00 | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: [C'TEE] MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Disp Code: 300 - ADVANCED Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR BACK RECORDS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BMK | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ATTY'S MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING DECL RE INVESTIGATION ASSESSMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.