Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gibbs, Shirley, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2002 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Minute Order
Date: March 20, 2003Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed on June 23, 2022 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator information sheet is due by July 11, 2023 and a review hearing is set for August 22, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel. |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only Annual Review Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Investigator's Information Sheet | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Investigator Conservatorship Review Report | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Re. Cost Assessment and Right to Object | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order Continuing Conservatorship |
|
August 24, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed July 7, 2021 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator's information sheet is...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the Court Investigator's report filed July 7, 2021 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator's information sheet is due by July 12, 2022 with a review hearing set on August 23, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel. |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.