Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sara Ellen Brockman filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person/Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Letters Issued | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Guard/Cons | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Child Abuse Central Index | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Summary | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Custody Order Granted: Guardianship | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition: Temporary Guard/Consvr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.