Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Concepcion Delaluz Hernandez filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCassidy, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person/Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Hearing | Petition Hearing | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Guard/Cons | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Custody Order Granted: Guardianship | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Summary | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardian Screening Form | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Dec in Support of TCO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.