Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perry, Michelle, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Petition
Date: August 25, 2020Petition
Date: September 25, 2020Conservatorship Review of Person & Estate
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Biennial Review
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Conservatorship Review of Person & Estate Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted FEES AND COSTS |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration VERIFIED DECLARATION BY PETITIONER AND RESPONSE TO CALENDAR NOTES |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF FILING INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL AND HOW TO OBJECT TO THE INVENTORY OR THE APPRAISED VALUE OF THE PROPERTY |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To LODGED DOCUMENT SENT TO CC |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Other Subsequent Petition Filed FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ACCOUNT AND FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES AND COSTS TO ATTYORNEYS FOR CONSERVATOR |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.