Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Signorello, Debra Ann, Signorello, Richard John, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2017 |
CategoryGuardianship |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Annual Review
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Minute Order Annual Review Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance -Guardian |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplemental Information | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Guardianship Status Report Sent | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Minute Order Annual Review Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance DEBRA S |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Status Report Filed CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY DEBRA ANN SIGNORELLO |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Guardianship Status Report Sent | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Petition Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.