Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jensen, Charles R., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2003 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT AND REPORT Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: ATTY UNIT |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER FROM QUEST | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY; COPY IN ATTY JENSEN BIN |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED: ROBERT NAKKEN WITH ORDER APPROVING SIXTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR BY MAILING ON 07-29-10 |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT & REPORT ON CONSERVATORSHIP ROBERT NAKKEN FOR DECEASED CONSERVATEE. CHARLES R. JENSEN FOR CONSERVATOR. COURT APPROVES ACCOUNT; SIGNS ORDER; SUBMITS TO COUNSEL FOR FILING. Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER APPROVING SIXTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR | |
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PROBATE FILE AWAY |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: prop order | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: atty unit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.